Economic Matters Committee, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0059
    (SB0085 / CH0338)
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and ReorganizationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0060 / CH0084Insurance - Certificate of Qualification, Licensing, and Registration - Electronic MeansApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Economic Matters
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0188 / CH0478Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of InformationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.