Economic Matters Committee, Chair

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0135 / CH0250Unemployment Insurance - Electronic Transmission of Information and Documents - AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0136 / CH0106Insurance - Public AdjustersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0137 / CH0245
    (SB0021 / CH0244)
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by AssessmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0138 / CH0247
    (SB0006 / CH0246)
Occupational and Professional Licensing Boards, Commissions, and Regulatory Entities - Notifications of Applicants, Licensees, Registrants, and Permit HoldersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0139 / CH0251Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal RightsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0140 / CH0252State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Supervision of Appraiser TraineesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0141 / CH0248
    (SB0017 / CH0249)
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation ClosingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0161Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RestructuringIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0182 / CH0253Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0245 / CH0259Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and RestructuringApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0246 / CH0254Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0247Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous RevisionsIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0248 / CH0255Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Special Fund and FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 255Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0250 / CH0256State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Special Fund and FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0810 / CH0257Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0142
    (SB0033)
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and RecordsIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherFinancial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:45 P.M.