Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 20)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0053 / CH0171Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested CasesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
SB0054 / CH0172Maryland Higher Education Commission - Scholarship Funds - Technical AlterationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 172Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0055 / CH0009Private Career Schools - Solicitor Permits - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 9Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0056 / CH0010Unauthorized Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Transcripts, Diplomas, and Grade Reports - PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0057State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil PenaltyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0058 / CH0439Adult Education and Literacy Services - High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0059 / CH0173Natural Resources - Fish and FisheriesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 173Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0060 / CH0011Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans - Financial Assistance for Families of Limited IncomeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0061 / CH0012Environment - Public Hearings - Notice RequirementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
SB0062 / CH0013Community Legacy Program - Application Requirements - Approval by Authorized DesigneeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 13Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0063 / CH0014Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational InstitutionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 14Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0064 / CH0015Controlled Hazardous Substance Vehicles - Display of CertificatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 15Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
SB0066 / CH0440Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Membership, Quorum, Meetings, and ReportsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 440Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0077State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas FittersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0078Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - ClaimsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0084State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency RequirementsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0179Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm PermitsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0180 / CH0027Department of Agriculture - State Chemist FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 27Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
SB0280 / CH0454Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency RequirementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0672
    (HB1096 / CH0401)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.