Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 22)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0045Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm PermitsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0046State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil PenaltyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0070 / CH0011Agriculture - Fertilizer - Labeling and Restrictions on Use and SaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
SB0071 / CH0012Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of EasementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
SB0090 / CH0019Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of RegistrationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEthics (G2)
SB0091 / CH0020State Ethics Commission - Local Governments and School Boards - Compliance EnforcementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 20Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEthics (G2)
SB0092 / CH0021Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Ethics Training RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEthics (G2)
SB0093 / CH0022Natural Resources - Recreational Incentives Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0101 / CH0028Environment - Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund - Use of FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 28Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
SB0102 / CH0029Health - Use of Alternate Care Sites During a State of Emergency - AuthorizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 29Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0107 / CH0130State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background InvestigationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
SB0108 / CH0131State Lottery - Unlawful RepresentationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0109 / CH0032Public Ethics - Financial Disclosure Statements - Electronic FilingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEthics (G2)
SB0110 / CH0132Institutions of Higher Education - Fully Online Distance Education - Registration and FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 132Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0111 / CH0133Maryland Higher Education Commission - Advisory CouncilsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 133Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0112 / CH0134Maryland Higher Education Commission - Innovative Partnerships for Technology Program - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 134Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0118 / CH0033Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - FacilitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0120 / CH0136Education - Children With Disabilities - Parent SurrogatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0124 / CH0138Education Coordinating Committee and Lida Lee Tall Learning Resources Center - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0125State-Aided Educational Institutions - Qualification CriteriaIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0127 / CH0036Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation ProjectApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
SB0129 / CH0037Public Ethics - Officials and Regulated Lobbyists - Late-Filing PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEthics (G2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.