Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 9)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0004 / CH0340Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and ReauthorizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0006 / CH0246
    (HB0138 / CH0247)
Occupational and Professional Licensing Boards, Commissions, and Regulatory Entities - Notifications of Applicants, Licensees, Registrants, and Permit HoldersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 246Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0013Public Safety - State MilitiaIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0018 / CH0283Public Ethics - Bicounty Commissions - Financial DisclosureApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEthics (G2)
SB0028State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery ServiceIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
SB0041 / CH0669State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 669Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0044 / CH0539Records Management and Preservation - State Units and Public Officials - ResponsibilitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 539Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0548 / CH0824
    (HB0824 / CH0823)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 824Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0549 / CH0217
    (HB1265 / CH0218)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:19 P.M.