Environmental Matters Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 9)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0095 / CH0608Environment - Permits - New Source Performance StandardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
HB0096 / CH0080Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water TestingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Environmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0097 / CH0081Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81Environmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
HB0362 / CH0615Public Ethics - Definition of "Interest" - Mutual FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 615Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEthics (G2)
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0613 / CH0624Sustainable Communities - Designation and FinancingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0706 / CH0384Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1429 / CH0418Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - EmploymentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEthics (G2)
HB1440 / CH0686Recycling - Composting FacilitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 686Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.