Finance Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0065 / CH0016Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of DecisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 16Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0079Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory Councils - Renaming and TerminationIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0080 / CH0177Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Prescription Monitoring DataApproved by the Governor - Chapter 177Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0081 / CH0020Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 20Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0082 / CH0441Elevator Safety - Third-Party Inspectors - CertificationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0083 / CH0178Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access PointApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)
SB0085 / CH0021Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port FacilitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0305 / CH0224
    (HB0296)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - OtherPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.