Finance Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0013Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)
SB0054 / CH0120Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training CouncilApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0089 / CH0018Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - ExceptionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0096 / CH0023Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 23Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0097 / CH0024Insurance - Public Adjusters - Prohibited InducementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 24Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0098 / CH0025Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing RulesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 25Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0099 / CH0026Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal ActionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 26Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0100 / CH0027Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative ExpensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 27Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0103 / CH0030Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and ModernizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0104 / CH0275Health Officers and Baltimore City Commissioner of Health - Authority to Retain Collections and Waive ChargesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 275Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0105 / CH0031Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Finance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0119 / CH0034Workers' Compensation - Subsequent Injury Fund - Billing Address NotificationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0126 / CH0139
    (HB0173)
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - ExemptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0130 / CH0038Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic SharingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0527
    (HB0988 / CH0434)
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHorse Racing (C6)
SB0893 / CH0355
    (HB0823)
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and ClarificationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.