Finance Committee, Chair

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 14)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0002 / CH0512Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary MapsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0008 / CH0036Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Finance
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0015 / CH0504Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial StatementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0017 / CH0249
    (HB0141 / CH0248)
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation ClosingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 249Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0019 / CH0037Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and ReinsurersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0021 / CH0244
    (HB0137 / CH0245)
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by AssessmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0025 / CH0716Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab ServiceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 716Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0031 / CH0038Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for FilingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0032 / CH0039Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0033
    (HB0142)
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and RecordsIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0038 / CH0040Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and CouncilsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0040 / CH0041Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site ReviewsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0047 / CH0207Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care QualityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)
SB0048 / CH0042Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment PeriodApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:45 A.M.