Frederick County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0178 / CH0072
    (SB0198 / CH0071)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of SaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0179 / CH0493
    (SB0209)
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - BarbershopsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0396
    (SB0326)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop LicensesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0474
    (SB0188)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center Phase 2In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0475
    (SB0187)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0645
    (SB0518 / CH0075)
Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of OperationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0646 / CH0074
    (SB0453 / CH0073)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily ReceiptsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0655
    (SB0519 / CH0494)
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0976
    (SB0550)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
By Request - CommitteeEthics (G2)
HB1182 / CH0495
    (SB0827)
Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:19 P.M.