Frederick County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 14)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0175
    (SB0314)
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0256 / CH0610Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Direct Judicial ReviewApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0276Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Use of Rifles In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0402
    (SB0320)
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic CannabinoidsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0405Frederick County - Board of License Commissioners - Expanded MembershipIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0407
    (SB0325)
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control StandardsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeEnvironment (M3)
HB0410 / CH0230
    (SB0321 / CH0229)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 230Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0414 / CH0228
    (SB0315 / CH0227)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0429
    (SB0319)
Frederick County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for All-Terrain and Utility-Terrain VehiclesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0432
    (SB0316)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeEthics (G2)
HB0434
    (SB0317)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeEnvironment (M3)
HB0488Frederick County - Synthetic Cannabinoids - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1025
    (SB0564)
Frederick County - Forest Conservation Act - Application to Public School PropertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1387 / CH0591
    (SB0957 / CH0590)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.