Frederick County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 12)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0321 / CH0595
    (SB0616)
Frederick County - Property Tax - Exemption for Property Owned by Affordable Housing Land TrustApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0323 / CH0312
    (SB0613 / CH0311)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient ChargeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0324
    (SB0277)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters By Request - CommitteeEnvironment (M3)
HB0329 / CH0097
    (SB0615)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 97Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0433 / CH0405
    (SB0619)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0472
    (SB0618 / CH0313)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Inn LicensesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0476 / CH0541
    (SB0614 / CH0540)
Frederick County - Payment of WagesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Economic Matters
2/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0485
    (SB0617 / CH0184)
Frederick County - Sheriff - SalaryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1112 / CH0357
    (SB0897 / CH0356)
Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 357Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1205 / CH0645
    (SB0993)
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 645Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1362
    (SB0010)
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB1386
    (SB1033)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Sampling or TastingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.