Frederick County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 13)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0320 / CH0481
    (SB0884)
Frederick County - Property Tax - Small Business Tax CreditApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0601
    (SB0466)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - RateIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0605 / CH0443
    (SB0859 / CH0442)
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative AppealsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0840 / CH0634
    (SB0699)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater and Entertainment Center LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0841 / CH0126
    (SB0693)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0842 / CH0635
    (SB0696)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Gallery Beer and Wine LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 635Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0843 / CH0127
    (SB0695)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0844 / CH0128
    (SB0694)
Frederick County - Alcohol Awareness Program - Absence From Licensed PremisesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 128Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0859
    (SB1029)
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate - Applicability to Public School Construction Projects in Frederick CountyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1031 / CH0291
    (SB0860)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1098
    (SB1055)
Frederick County - Public School Construction - State FundingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1109 / CH0133
    (SB0861)
Frederick County - Dry Election Districts - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 133Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1149
    (SB0874)
Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology - FundingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.