Frederick County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 13)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0501 / CH0092
    (SB0219 / CH0091)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seating Requirement for Class B LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0506 / CH0094
    (SB0220 / CH0093)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0507 / CH0096
    (SB0263 / CH0095)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0630 / CH0273
    (SB0289 / CH0272)
Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License CommissionersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB0762 / CH0277
    (SB0447 / CH0276)
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli ShopsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0826
    (SB0503)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0828
    (SB0507)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Museum of the IronworkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0830
    (SB0506)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Frederick County YMCAIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0831
    (SB0504)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0833
    (SB0505)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - CrossRoads Freedom Center Recovery HousingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0917 / CH0275
    (SB1032 / CH0274)
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - CompositionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 275Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1671
    (SB1108)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Brunswick Junior RailroadersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1673
    (SB1232)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The RanchIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 27, 2018 1:12 P.M.