Garrett County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0318 / CH0222Garrett County - Salary Study Commission - Member ReplacementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0343
    (SB0383 / CH0295)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio MemberVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0515
    (SB0532)
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Christian Crossing Thrift ShopIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0541
    (SB0474)
Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - ExtensionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means By Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0690 / CH0418Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Off-Premises ConsumptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0836 / CH0428Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A2 Light Wine Licenses - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0987
    (SB0598)
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - HART Animal CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1097 / CH0445Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises ConsumptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 445Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.