Harford County Senators

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0146 / CH0052Harford County - State's Attorney - SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Judicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0916 / CH0448Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community College LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 448Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1088
    (HB0806)
Alcoholic Beverages - Harford County - License and Permit Fees and Repealing Obsolete ProvisionsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1104 / CH0525
    (HB1624 / CH0526)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.