Health and Government Operations Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 9)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0164 / CH0084Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regulatory Authority - Permit and Licensing Renewals and Building Plan ReviewsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB0359 / CH0614Militia - Maryland Defense Force - Enlistment PeriodApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0360 / CH0106Health Insurance - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of LawApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0361 / CH0368Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0401 / CH0112Military Department - Powers of the Adjutant General - Summary Courts-MartialApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0724 / CH0385Insurance - Risk Based Capital Standards - Fraternal Benefit Societies and Life InsurersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1390 / CH0681Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1096 / CH0401
    (SB0672)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1348 / CH0680Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Revisions and ClarificationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 680Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.