Health and Government Operations Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 15)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0013 / CH0081Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - RegulationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0014Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement UnitsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0102 / CH0082Procurement Advisory Council - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 82Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0105 / CH0083Maryland Health Care Commission - Powers - Authority to Award Funds and Make Agreements With Grantees and PayeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 83Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB0106 / CH0084Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset ExtensionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0207 / CH0589State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building CouncilApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Health and Government Operations
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0534Maryland Intrastate Hospital Assistance CompactIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0590 / CH0413Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB0629 / CH0604Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 604Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0668 / CH0417Income Tax Credit - Health Enterprise Zones - ModificationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB1488State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - RevisionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1510 / CH0460Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and DutiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB1511Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0823
    (SB0893 / CH0355)
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and ClarificationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.