Health and Government Operations Committee, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0186 / CH0317Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Health and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0788 / CH0119Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Program Oversight and ContinuationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Health and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0798 / CH0121Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0800Health Insurance - Payments to Noncontracting Specialists and Noncontracting Nonphysician SpecialistsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0801 / CH0122Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal LawApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0802Health Insurance - Provider Panel ListsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB1220 / CH0136Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery ActivitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB0497 / CH0360
    (SB0200 / CH0359)
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.