Health and Government Operations Committee, Chair

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0166Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - RevisionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsBy Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0167State Government - Notices and Communications - Use of Electronic MeansIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0168 / CH0103State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Health and Government Operations
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0248Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - QualificationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0384Substance Use Facilities and Programs - Certificate of Need - Repeal of RequirementIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB1726Maryland Dentistry Act - RevisionsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1792Maryland Department of Health - Deputy Secretary for Operations and Director of the Behavioral Health Administration - Repeal of PositionsIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB0742 / CH0756
    (SB0552 / CH0757)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 756Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:39 A.M.