Howard County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 18)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0450 / CH0116Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Renovated, Upgraded, or Rehabilitated Property Ho. Co. 11-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0454Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 8-13In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0455 / CH0117Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Ho. Co. 15-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0456
    (SB0559)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Belmont Property Restoration Ho. Co. 5-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0457
    (SB0562)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area Ho. Co. 1-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0460
    (SB0560)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc's Homewood Road Renovation Ho. Co. 2-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0461
    (SB0558)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Ho. Co. 6-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0462
    (SB0561)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Blandair Regional Park Ho. Co. 4-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0895 / CH0648Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0901 / CH0142Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Establishments - Distance from SchoolsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 142Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1240 / CH0149Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 10-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1404
    (SB0992)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1405Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Brewery License Ho. Co. 17-13In the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1406 / CH0416
    (SB0003)
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increases Ho. Co. 13-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1407 / CH0153Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1409Howard County - Winery Special Events Permits - Farmers' Markets Ho. Co. 16-13In the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1419Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Linwood CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1514 / CH0421Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.