Howard County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 12)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0449
    (SB0426)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Head Start Program Retrofitting Ho. Co. 5-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0455
    (SB0425)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Belmont Property and Historic Garden Restoration Ho. Co. 6-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0456
    (SB0643)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 10-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0466
    (SB0427)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Day Resource Center Ho. Co. 4-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0470
    (SB0424)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Shaded Structures for Playgrounds Ho. Co. 7-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0471Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Howard County - Supported Living Facility Ho. Co. 11-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1084Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-14In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1090Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population Restriction on Class A Licenses Ho. Co. 1-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1091 / CH0443Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Festivals Ho. Co. 09-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1092Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB1093 / CH0444Howard County Board of Education - Members - Salary Increase Ho. Co. 2-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1411Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 12-14In the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.