Howard County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 13)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0621
    (SB0040)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0631 / CH0493Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Howard County Deputy Sheriffs Ho. Co. 11-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0632 / CH0622Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Luxury Restaurants and Farm Breweries - Licenses Ho. Co. 14-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0650
    (SB0609)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0651
    (SB0610)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - South Branch Park Ho. Co. 3-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0652
    (SB0611)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Huntington Park Ho. Co. 4-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0653
    (SB0613)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 6-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0654 / CH0625Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 10-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0655 / CH0272Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0656
    (SB0612)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Solomon's Lodge #121 Ho. Co. 5-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0671 / CH0626Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1090 / CH0130
    (SB0670)
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1105 / CH0132Howard County Public School System - Access to Public Information Ho. Co. 9-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:08 P.M.