Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 14)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0071Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement PlansIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0072 / CH0176Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0073 / CH0018Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening StandardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0074Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0075 / CH0019Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of CitationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0086 / CH0022Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of AssistanceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0087 / CH0179Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0181Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support ObligationIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsBy Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0229
    (HB0282)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0262 / CH0035
    (HB0129)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0263
    (HB0130)
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and ExpensesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0264 / CH0036
    (HB0277)
Children in Need of Assistance - Review HearingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)
SB0265 / CH0037
    (HB0278)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.