Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 19)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0006 / CH0003Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance TechnicianApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0026 / CH0005Motor Vehicles - Commercial Instructional Permit Holders - Administrative Penalties and ProceduresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0033 / CH0006Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) LanesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0072 / CH0013Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load LimitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 13Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0077 / CH0014Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility EmergenciesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 14Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0086 / CH0127Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load LimitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0087 / CH0017Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat OffendersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 17Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0094Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0113
    (HB0159)
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - PenaltyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0114
    (HB0174 / CH0217)
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and DutiesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0115
    (HB0163)
Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional FacilitiesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0116 / CH0135Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination DateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Judicial Proceedings
1/9/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0117Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement VisitsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/9/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0122 / CH0035Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation HearingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Judicial Proceedings
1/9/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0032
    (HB0108)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0061
    (HB0038)
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to AppealIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0064 / CH0468
    (HB0001)
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational StabilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)
SB0068
    (HB0079 / CH0213)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsIn the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0069 / CH0124
    (HB0045)
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - ExceptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.