Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0077 / CH0157Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster YouthApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0078 / CH0044State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted PrizesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
SB0079 / CH0045State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case InformationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalChildren (O4)
SB0080 / CH0158Commercial Drivers' Licenses - Cancellations and Downgrades (Driving Privilege Preservation Act of 2016)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0081Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination DateIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0082Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - RepealIn the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0083 / CH0529Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0360 / CH0381
    (HB0192 / CH0382)
Juvenile Causes - Permanency Plans - Age Restrictions on Use of Another Planned Permanent Living ArrangementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:08 P.M.