Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 13)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0005Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum AgeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0009Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected VehiclesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0011Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing BoardIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsBy Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0022 / CH0007Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claimant Award BasisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0024 / CH0008Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission RequirementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0027Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - ReportingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0030Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0035 / CH0194Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0037 / CH0009Funds - Obsolete Provisions - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 9Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0043 / CH0193Juvenile Court Records - DisclosureApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0045 / CH0195Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records ChecksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0746 / CH0834
    (HB0476)
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous CountyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0912 / CH0156
    (HB1219 / CH0157)
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex TraffickingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:20 P.M.