Judiciary Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 12)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0244 / CH0089Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena PowerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0245 / CH0090Family Law - Substance-Exposed NewbornsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
HB0246Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video ConferencingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0247 / CH0091Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - AdministrationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0264 / CH0611Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - DisclosureApproved by the Governor - Chapter 611Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0292 / CH0431Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of SunsetApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0430 / CH0371Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor VehiclesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0129
    (SB0262 / CH0035)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0130
    (SB0263)
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and ExpensesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0277
    (SB0264 / CH0036)
Children in Need of Assistance - Review HearingsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)
HB0278
    (SB0265 / CH0037)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)
HB0282
    (SB0229)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherJuvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.