Judiciary Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 13)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0159
    (SB0113)
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - PenaltyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0163
    (SB0115)
Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional FacilitiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0173
    (SB0126 / CH0139)
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - ExemptionVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0174 / CH0217
    (SB0114)
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and DutiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Judiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0178 / CH0086Family Law - Adoption, Search, Contact, and Reunion Services - Relatives of Minors in Out-of-Home PlacementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 86Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
HB0179 / CH0087Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
HB0001
    (SB0064 / CH0468)
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational StabilityVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)
HB0038
    (SB0061)
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to AppealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0045
    (SB0069 / CH0124)
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - ExceptionVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0079 / CH0213
    (SB0068)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 213Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - OtherJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0108
    (SB0032)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0500Judgeships - District CourtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0537Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public DefenderIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.