Judiciary Committee, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0076 / CH0610Department of State Police - Investigation AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0077 / CH0611Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory CouncilApproved by the Governor - Chapter 611Judiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
HB0078 / CH0092State Fire Marshal - Reporting Requirements - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0162Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection ActIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0192 / CH0382
    (SB0360 / CH0381)
Juvenile Causes - Permanency Plans - Age Restrictions on Use of Another Planned Permanent Living ArrangementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Judiciary
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:08 P.M.