Judicial Conference, Maryland

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0129
    (SB0262 / CH0035)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0277
    (SB0264 / CH0036)
Children in Need of Assistance - Review HearingsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)
HB0278
    (SB0265 / CH0037)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)
HB0282
    (SB0229)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0229
    (HB0282)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0262 / CH0035
    (HB0129)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0264 / CH0036
    (HB0277)
Children in Need of Assistance - Review HearingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)
SB0265 / CH0037
    (HB0278)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.