Montgomery County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 13)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0645 / CH0128Montgomery County - Sale of Alcoholic Beverages - Distance from Schools, Places of Worship, or Youth Centers MC 16-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0646 / CH0629
    (SB0918)
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations MC 5-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0647 / CH0129Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Beer and Wine Sampling or Tasting MC 9-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0648Montgomery County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets MC 3-13In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0649 / CH0130Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0670 / CH0132Montgomery County - Board of Education Districts - Town of Kensington in One District MC 1-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0671Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 2-13In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0672 / CH0133Montgomery County - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder - Class H Licenses MC 17-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0674 / CH0382Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 8-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0675 / CH0134Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Burtonsville MC 14-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0676Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB0677 / CH0135Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1510Montgomery County - Transportation - Block GrantIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeCapital Budget (B5)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:49 A.M.