Montgomery County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 18)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0131
    (SB0302 / CH0289)
Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale License MC 18-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0132 / CH0485
    (SB0305 / CH0484)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers MC 19-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0135 / CH0385
    (SB0313)
Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages - Special B-K Licenses MC 15-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0136 / CH0386
    (SB0298)
Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals MC 11-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0137 / CH0387
    (SB0301)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License MC 9-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0138
    (SB0309 / CH0290)
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 5-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0139
    (SB0308)
Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator MC 17-14In the House - Hearing cancelledHealth and Government Operations By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0140
    (SB0310 / CH0055)
Montgomery County - Micro-Brewery Licenses and Class D Beer and Light Wine Licenses MC 3-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0141
    (SB0306 / CH0054)
Montgomery County - Barbershops - Restriction on Operation Repealed MC 1-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0142
    (SB0300 / CH0483)
Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) Licenses MC 14-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0143
    (SB0312)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers MC 6-14In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0144 / CH0586
    (SB0307)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 12-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0146 / CH0388
    (SB0311)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License MC 7-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0147
    (SB0299 / CH0482)
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts MC 13-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0269
    (SB0459 / CH0504)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License MC 20-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0463
    (SB0657 / CH0324)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 16-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0638
    (SB0815 / CH0197)
Criminal Law - Telecommunication Devices in Place of Confinement - Montgomery County Work Release and Prerelease Programs MC 21-14Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0960
    (SB1025)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement MC 22-14In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.