Montgomery County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 21)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0306 / CH0127Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting at Dispensaries MC 19-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0307 / CH0117Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distilleries - Class B and Class D Licenses MC 6-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0308Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses MC 20-17In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0309 / CH0305Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0310 / CH0459Montgomery County - Deer Hunting - Sundays MC 21-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0311 / CH0128Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-BW Licenses MC 9-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0313 / CH0443Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 10-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0315 / CH0442Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Contracts to Sell Liquor for Off-Premises Consumption MC 18-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0332Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 23-17In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0337Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limit in Business and Residential Districts MC 22-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0342 / CH0129Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Extension MC 3-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0346 / CH0118Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers MC 1-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0348Montgomery County - Staggered Election Terms for Members of the County Council MC 4-17In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB0350Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0365Montgomery County - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Affirmative Consent MC 14-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0386 / CH0444Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0397 / CH0306Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0460Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator MC 26-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0560 / CH0130Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale MC 8-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0761Montgomery County - Democratic Party Central Committee - Membership - Gender Requirements MC 27-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB1570Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority MC/PG 111-17In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:43 P.M.