Montgomery County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 19)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0143Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0144 / CH0119Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Club Off-Sale Permit MC 10-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0145 / CH0289Montgomery County - Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses MC 12-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0146 / CH0288Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery License - Issuance MC 9-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0147Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Inspections and Statements During Initial License Year MC 7-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0148 / CH0120Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses MC 8-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0150 / CH0121Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0153Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dispensaries in Retail Grocery Stores MC 16-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0159 / CH0122Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit MC 21-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0171Montgomery County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Shochu and Soju MC 20-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0172 / CH0123Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0173Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 19-18In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB0176Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-18In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0177 / CH0124Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0178 / CH0125Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0220 / CH0126Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County - Subsidiary Entities MC 18-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0278 / CH0127Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0594
    (SB0902)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Poolesville Grape Crushing Economic Development FacilityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0995Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 27, 2018 1:12 P.M.