Montgomery County Delegation & Prince George's Co Deleg

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 13)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0633Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Supplementary Salary MC/PG 106-13In the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0634Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0635Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Restrictions on Commissioners from Montgomery County MC/PG 102-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0636 / CH0124Washington Suburban Sanitary District - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 103-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0637 / CH0626Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0638 / CH0125Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Minority Business Enterprise Programs and Task Force Extension MC/PG 107-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125Health and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0639 / CH0627Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0640 / CH0126Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Notice Requirements MC/PG 115-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0641 / CH0127Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing MC/PG 113-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0642 / CH0628Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Posting Requirements MC/PG 114-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0650 / CH0630Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Prevailing Wage MC/PG 112-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1239Washington Metropolitan Area Transit District - Establishment of Sales Outlets in Prince George's County MC/PG 117-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.