Prince George's County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 27)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1070 / CH0144Alcoholic Beverages - City of College Park - Sales by License Holders Near School Buildings PG 309-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1071Prince George's County - City of College Park - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses for Supermarkets PG 310-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1072 / CH0663Alcoholic Beverages - City of Laurel - Sales by License Holders PG 308-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1073 / CH0664Prince George's County Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum PG 419-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/8/2013 - 3:45 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1074 / CH0665Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale and Fee for Golf Course Licenses PG 318-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1078Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit PG 302-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1079 / CH0145Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Salary of Part-Time Liquor Inspectors PG 316-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1080Prince George's County Public Schools - Certificated Professional Individuals - Termination of Employment PG 417-13In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1081 / CH0666Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Permit - Class BH Licensees PG 301-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1082 / CH0400Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses and Class B-AE Licenses PG 317-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1083Prince George's County - Gaming - Charity Chips PG 312-13In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB1105 / CH0667Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers PG 311-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1107 / CH0147Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative PG 411-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1108Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Artificial Turf Fields PG 404-13In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1111Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 401-13In the House - First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic MattersEnvironmental Matters
Economic Matters
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1145 / CH0668Task Force to Study Energy Generation in Prince George's County PG 416-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1146 / CH0669Task Force to Study Locating Businesses in Libraries in Prince George's County PG 415-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1150Prince George's County - Food Service Facilities - Letter Grading PG 313-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB1285Prince George's County - Public School Construction Fee and Fund - Authority to Establish and Administer PG 402-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1309Prince George's County - Education - Consolidated and Coordinated Procurement PG 405-13In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1338 / CH0677Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 306-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1349 / CH0152Prince George's County Sheriff - Compensation and Salaries PG 319-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1431 / CH0683Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Towne Centre at Laurel PG 320-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683Economic Matters
4/8/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1432 / CH0684Prince George's County - Public Safety Surcharge PG 421-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1433 / CH0685Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1454Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1456Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance or Transfer of Class A Licenses Near Correctional Facilities PG 321-13In the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.