Prince George's County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 24)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1220Prince George's County - Commission of Crime of Violence in Presence of Minor PG 313-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1257Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax RateIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1266
    (SB0995)
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1272Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeFamily Law (D4)
HB1274Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1317 / CH0812Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017 PG 310-17Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 812Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1324Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Commission to Study Licensing and Regulation of Sales PG 311-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1551 / CH0456Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHuman Relations (D5)
HB1565Prince George's County Board of Education - Election of Vice Chair, Voting Procedures, and Final Report PG 402-17In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1566Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses PG 307-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1567Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1568 / CH0336Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 415-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1569Prince George's County - Juvenile Offender in Need of Supervision Program - Study PG 304-17In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1570Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority MC/PG 111-17In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1571Prince George's County School System Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Task Force PG 416-17In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1572Prince George's County - Authority to Prohibit the Use of Disposable Bags PG 422-17In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1573 / CH0819Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1574 / CH0457Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 305-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457Judiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB1575Prince George's County - Duties of Sheriff - Responding to Domestic Violence Calls PG xx-17In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1576 / CH0311Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1577Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge Exemption - Veteran Housing PG 410-17In the House - Rereferred to Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1578 / CH0147Prince George's County - Property Tax Exemption for Economic Development Projects - Sunset Extension PG 407-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1622Prince George's County Board of Education - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative - Repeal PG 401-17In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1636 / CH0455Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:21 P.M.