Prince George's County Delegation & Montgomery Co Deleg

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0973 / CH0628Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0974Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0975Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0977 / CH0629Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police - Workers' Compensation - Lyme Disease Presumption - Repeal of Termination Date PG/MC 110-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629Economic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB1075 / CH0639Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1334Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.