President, The

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 22)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0125
    (HB0100 / CH0423)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)In the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0126
    (HB0101 / CH0424)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012In the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0141
    (HB0115 / CH0426)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
By Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsBy Request - AdministrationInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
SB0276 / CH0156
    (HB0295)
Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of ParoleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 12:30 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0277
    (HB0229 / CH0004)
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable IncomeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0278 / CH0001
    (HB0227 / CH0002)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0279 / CH0157
    (HB0224 / CH0158)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
By Request - AdministrationPublic Safety (E4)
SB0538
    (HB0560 / CH0005)
Public-Private PartnershipsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0841 / CH0428
    (HB0863)
Higher Education Fair Share ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesBy Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0236
    (HB0210)
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0237 / CH0211
    (HB0206)
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0238 / CH0212
    (HB0209)
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 212Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0239 / CH0034
    (HB0083)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0283 / CH0042Annual Curative BillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0284 / CH0043Annual Corrective BillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsBy Request - OtherElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:50 A.M.