St. Mary's County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0884 / CH0283
    (SB1001)
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local ProvisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0889 / CH0284
    (SB0997)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission Bonds - Extension of Maximum Maturity DateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 284Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0890 / CH0129
    (SB0996)
St. Mary's County - Local Landlord and Tenant Law - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0917 / CH0599
    (SB0998 / CH0598)
St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding BusinessesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 599Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0972
    (SB0995 / CH0236)
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - RepealVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1062 / CH0601
    (SB1015 / CH0600)
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Permits, Training, Prohibited Acts, and ViolationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 601Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1092 / CH0297
    (SB0999)
St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 297Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1185
    (SB1000)
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - RepealIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:09 P.M.