St. Mary's County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 20)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0108 / CH0293
    (SB0104 / CH0292)
St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - DogsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0109 / CH0299
    (SB0102 / CH0298)
St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0111
    (SB0105)
St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of RevenueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0163 / CH0287
    (SB0162 / CH0286)
St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0187 / CH0290
    (SB0103 / CH0291)
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of ProvisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0194 / CH0048
    (SB0101 / CH0047)
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0207 / CH0050
    (SB0140 / CH0049)
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0208 / CH0052
    (SB0163 / CH0051)
St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0209 / CH0295
    (SB0124 / CH0294)
St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 295Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0243 / CH0423
    (SB0394)
St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0404 / CH0425
    (SB0234)
St. Mary's County - Land Records - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0431 / CH0119
    (SB0297 / CH0120)
St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local ProvisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0526 / CH0288St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Establishment LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0538 / CH0289St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0679 / CH0296
    (SB0395 / CH0297)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - PersonnelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 296Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0682
    (SB0298 / CH0428)
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - SalariesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0700
    (SB0738)
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0892 / CH0427
    (SB0736)
St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0914
    (SB0735 / CH0426)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow MoneyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1055
    (SB0737 / CH0424)
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and RepaymentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:02 P.M.