Speaker, The

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 34)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0150
    (SB0190 / CH0143)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017)In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriationsBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0151
    (SB0191 / CH0027)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriationsBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0449
    (SB0375)
Relief From Budget MandatesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0450
    (SB0386)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0451
    (SB0377 / CH0145)
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Revenue Distribution - Maryland State Arts CouncilVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationGaming (C7)
HB0452
    (SB0384)
Earned Income Tax Credit - ExpansionIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8)Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0453Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0454 / CH0037
    (SB0378 / CH0023)
State Employees - Merit Increases in SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0455
    (SB0387)
Income Tax Exemption Amount - Elderly IndividualsIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0456
    (SB0382)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPublic Health (J1)
HB0457
    (SB0385)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0458
    (SB0380)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0460
    (SB0381 / CH0146)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage LoansVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0461
    (SB0388)
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and FundingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0462 / CH0010
    (SB0383)
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0463
    (SB0379 / CH0198)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0464
    (SB0376 / CH0144)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Schools Act of 2016In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0074 / CH0091
    (SB0117)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0084
    (SB0116 / CH0049)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0140 / CH0477
    (SB0206)
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 477Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0535 / CH0721
    (SB0734 / CH0722)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement TransfereesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1016 / CH0519Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherPublic Safety (E4)
HB1159
    (SB0773)
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - RestrictionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1250
    (SB0841)
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - ExemptionIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1251
    (SB0844)
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1252
    (SB0842)
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor ApportionmentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1253
    (SB0840)
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - RefundabilityIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1254
    (SB0845)
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation HolidayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1255
    (SB0843 / CH0582)
Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset ProvisionsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherPublic Safety (E4)
HB1313
    (SB1006)
Justice Reinvestment Act - Criminal PenaltiesIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1314
    (SB0772)
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a PartyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBy Request - OtherFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB1491
    (SB0771 / CH0579)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - RestrictionsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:09 P.M.