Speaker, The

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 37)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0098
    (SB0135)
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0099
    (SB0134)
Small Business Relief Tax CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0100
    (SB0199)
Criminal Law - Violent Offenders - Penalties (Accountability for Violent Criminals Act of 2018)In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0101
    (SB0197)
Crimes - Firearms - PenaltiesIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0102
    (SB0198)
Criminal Gang Offenses – Penalties, Procedure, and ElementsIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0160
    (SB0185)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019)In the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0161
    (SB0187)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0162
    (SB0186)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017In the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0346
    (SB0297)
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human TraffickingIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0347
    (SB0294)
Government Accountability Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0348
    (SB0293)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0349
    (SB0296)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0350
    (SB0300)
Achieving Computer Science Collaborations for Employing Students Statewide (ACCESS) Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0351
    (SB0301)
Protect Our Students Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0352
    (SB0295)
Transparency Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0353
    (SB0298)
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act)In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0354
    (SB0299)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018)In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0355
    (SB0302)
Accountability in Education Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0357
    (SB0311)
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's License Fees - AlterationIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0358
    (SB0313)
Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Volume DealersIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0359
    (SB0309)
Health - Reporting of Overdose InformationIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPublic Health (J1)
HB0361
    (SB0314)
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0362
    (SB0312)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0363
    (SB0305)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0364
    (SB0310)
CyberMaryland Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0431
    (SB0308)
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB0875
    (SB0733)
Protecting Maryland Taxpayers Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0989
    (SB0877)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0097State Board of Law Examiners – Sunset ExtensionIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0658
    (SB0608)
State House Trust – Duties – Landscaping and Construction of Lawyer’s MallIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0874
    (SB0892)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1415
    (SB1092)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationIn the House - First Reading Ways and Means and AppropriationsWays and Means
Appropriations
By Request - OtherPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1439
    (SB0870)
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Subpoena PowerIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1480
    (SB0982)
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious OrdersIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1544
    (SB0891)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil PenaltyIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HJ0003
    (SJ0005)
Judicial Compensation Commission - RecommendationsIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

February 19, 2018 8:22 P.M.