Ways and Means Committee, Chair

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 12)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0089Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - ExtensionIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0090
    (SB0496 / CH0445)
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee PaymentsIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
HB0091
    (SB0495 / CH0339)
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of OwnershipIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
HB0092
    (SB0498 / CH0453)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0093
    (SB0497 / CH0446)
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal TermIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
HB0094 / CH0258Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0095Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - ExemptionIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0143 / CH0107Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and ProceduresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElections (G1)
HB0529 / CH0786Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign FinanceEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 786Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElections (G1)
HB0713 / CH0718Sales and Use Tax - Light Rail Vehicles - ExemptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 718Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0715 / CH0328Institutions of Higher Education - Teacher Preparation Programs - Accreditation and ApprovalApproved by the Governor - Chapter 328Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
HB0872Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development ProjectsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.