Ways and Means Committee, Chair

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0089 / CH0654Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - AdministrationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0090 / CH0102Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low AssessmentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0193 / CH0374
    (SB0043 / CH0373)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:03 P.M.