Washington County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 9)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0253
    (SB0535 / CH0495)
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip JarsIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedWays and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0546
    (SB0508 / CH0060)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0551 / CH0489
    (SB0506 / CH0488)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0552Public Secondary Schools - Fall Sports Season - Start DateIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0559 / CH0048
    (SB0408 / CH0047)
Washington County - Special Deputy SheriffsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0720 / CH0558
    (SB0814 / CH0557)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0792 / CH0059
    (SB0507 / CH0058)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB1060Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering BoundariesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB1511
    (SB1042)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.