Washington County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0217 / CH0590
    (SB0469)
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Washington County - WarrantsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0322
    (SB0692 / CH0327)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurant Seating Capacity and License QuotaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1385Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of InterestVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1399 / CH0250
    (SB1046)
Washington County - Sheriff and County Commissioners - SalariesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.