Washington County Delegation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 14)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0191 / CH0405
    (SB0071)
County Superintendents of Schools - Reappointment Exemption in Washington County and Recruitment RecommendationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0790
    (SB0635 / CH0187)
Washington County - Board of Education - Alternative Teacher Certification ProgramIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0793 / CH0276
    (SB0636)
Washington County - County ClerkApproved by the Governor - Chapter 276Environment and Transportation
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0794
    (SB0634 / CH0186)
Washington County - Liquor Tasting LicenseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0795 / CH0277
    (SB0632)
Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Expungement of ViolationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0797 / CH0278
    (SB0630)
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Population Ratio QuotaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0800
    (SB0638)
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local EnforcementIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0801 / CH0280
    (SB0750)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Conversion of Class P LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0835 / CH0105
    (SB0633)
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container PermitApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0836
    (SB0631 / CH0185)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Tasting License for Class B License Holders - RepealVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1162
    (SB0913 / CH0209)
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond ProceedsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1164
    (SB0925 / CH0211)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development ProjectsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1170
    (SB0637 / CH0188)
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual ReportsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1171
    (SB0923)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled VeteransIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.