Washington County Senators

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 14)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0227 / CH0362
    (HB0790 / CH0363)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled VeteransApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0516 / CH0070
    (HB0868 / CH0071)
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0517 / CH0217
    (HB0867)
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - ProcessApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0518
    (HB0831 / CH0279)
Washington County - Collection of Fees, Charges, Penalties, and AssessmentsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0519
    (HB0845)
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local EnforcementIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0520 / CH0397
    (HB0756)
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and RefundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0523
    (HB0779 / CH0118)
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Local PenaltiesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0877 / CH0586
    (HB1320 / CH0587)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0989
    (HB1557)
Washington County Board of Education - Access to Public School Courses - Nonpublic School StudentsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB1076 / CH0465
    (HB1551)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population Ratio Quota - Classes of LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1077 / CH0238
    (HB1548)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal ProceduresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1078 / CH0239
    (HB1549)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor - License FeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1079 / CH0605
    (HB1550)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 605Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1135 / CH0471Washington County - Business Licenses - Repeal of Zoning Certification RequirementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:09 P.M.